RI S2007 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Vja Realty, Llc

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Vja Realty, Llc

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16HouseReferred to House Corporations
2020-01-15SenateSenate read and passed
2020-01-14SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (01/15/2020)

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback