RI S2007 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-18 - House passed Sub B
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-18 - House passed Sub B
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the public finance management board to ascertain and report on the total amount of public debt no less than every two (2) years and requires cities/towns to submit report of relevant financial info with requests for bonds and indebtedness.
Title
Public Finance Management Board
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. William Walaska [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub B |
2016-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2016-06-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-15 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2016) |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Committee heard |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Substitute A |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/19/2016) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |