RI S2007 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Benefit Square Corporation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Benefit Square Corporation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-05 Effective without Governor's signature
2010-01-28 Transmitted to Governor
2010-01-28 House passed in concurrence
2010-01-26 Placed on House Calendar
2010-01-26 Committee recommends passage in concurrence
2010-01-26 Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2010-01-19 Referred to House Corporations
2010-01-13 Senate read and passed
2010-01-12 Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback