RI S2006 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes certain limitations on regulations promulgated by the department of health and the department of business regulation in regard to medical marijuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Food And Drugs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Passage *************************** (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05SenateSigned by Governor
2020-02-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2020-02-04HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2020-02-04HousePlaced on House Calendar (02/04/2020)
2020-02-04SenateSenate passed Sub A
2020-01-29SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (02/04/2020)
2020-01-28SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2020-01-27SenateProposed Substitute
2020-01-24SenateScheduled for consideration (01/28/2020)
2020-01-21SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2020-01-17SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/21/2020)
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback