RI S2006 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that nomination papers for certain candidates for citywide nonpartisan office in the city of Woonsocket would require at least one hundred (100) signatures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Elections-nomination Of Party And Independent Candidates-city Of Woonsocket

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-19HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-06-06HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2018-06-05SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/05/2018)
2018-05-29SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-25SenateScheduled for consideration (05/29/2018)
2018-05-03SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2018-05-03SenateCommittee recommended indefinite postponement
2018-04-27SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2018)
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback