RI S2003 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Plastic Waste Reduction Act" designed to reduce the use of plastic bags by retail establishments by offering recyclable bag options and providing penalties for violations.
Title
Plastic Waste Reduction Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/26/2020) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (02/12/2020) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2020) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |