RI S1080 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- State Police: would establish a "Blue Alert" system to assist in the apprehension of criminal suspects who are involved in the murder or serious injury of law enforcement personnel
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- State Police
Sponsors
Sen. James Doyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-30 | House passed in concurrence | |
2011-06-30 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-30 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-06-30 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-30 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-06-30 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-06-27 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S1080.pdf |