RI S1026 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Town of Cumberland’s board of licenses to approve the liquor license application for a business located at 88 Broad Street on tax assessor’s map plat 2 lot 32, plat 2 lot 51 and plat 2 lot 52.
Title
Relating To Alcoholic Beverages-retail Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |