RI S1023 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that all electrical work performed in the state be done in accordance with the latest edition of the National Electrical Code, and would also require that the state building commission adopt the latest edition of the National Electrical Code.
Title
State Building Code - Administration And Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |