RI S0996 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Financial Institutions: would allow credit unions to purchase, sell, and pledge loans or groups of loans under certain circumstances and would provide for conflicts of interest provisions with respect to the foregoing
Title
An Act Relating To Financial Institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-30 | House passed in concurrence | |
2011-06-29 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-28 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-06-27 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-27 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-06-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-06-16 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-06-16 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-06-01 | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0996.pdf |