RI S0990 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts any proposed retailers' Class B license to be located at 671 Broadway Street, Plat 35, Lot 566 in the city of Providence from the two hundred feet (200') requirement from schools or places of worship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2019-06-26HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-26SenateSenate read and passed
2019-06-26SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019)
2019-06-25SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-06-21SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2019)
2019-06-19SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback