RI S0985 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Names one of the two (2) new conference rooms at the Rhode Island Veterans Home as the "S. Michael Minutelli Memorial Conference Room".
Title
Permanent Joint Committee On Naming All New Buildings, Bridges, Edifices And Other State Constructions -- New Rhode Island Veterans Home Conference Room
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |