RI S0973 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Honoring Maestro Marshall Allen For His Momentous Music Career And Welcoming Him To Rhode Island In Joyous Celebration Of His 99th Birthday On May 25, 2023
Title
Senate Resolution Honoring Maestro Marshall Allen For His Momentous Music Career And Welcoming Him To Rhode Island In Joyous Celebration Of His 99th Birthday On May 25, 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/09/2023) |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0973.pdf |