RI S0972 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Scituate to issue not more than $4,900,000 bonds and notes to finance various improvements at the town of Scituate's schools.
Title
Authorizing The Town Of Scituate To Issue General Obligation Bonds And Notes In An Amount Not To Exceed $4,900,000 To Finance Replacements, Renovations And Improvements Including A New Track And Field At The Scituate Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-26 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |