RI S0970 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
For motor vehicle alcohol-related offense blood/urine testing and ignition interlock system may be ordered.
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |