RI S0927 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Warren town council, by ordinance, to administratively issue and renew all licenses the council is authorized to issue pursuant to state law, except those licenses that require a public hearing.
Title
Licensure Streamlining In The Town Of Warren
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Licensure streamlining town of warren (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Licensure streamlining town of warren (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-15 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-09-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (09/15/2017) |
2017-06-30 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |