RI S0903 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2019)
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Hearing: Jun 20 House Special Legislation Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows Robert Paul Hasenstab to join Lyndsie Martha Andrade and Christopher Drew Chamberlin in marriage on or about October 13, 2019, within the City of Newport, Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2019)
2019-06-13HouseReferred to House Special Legislation
2019-06-12SenateSenate read and passed
2019-06-11SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2019)
2019-06-06SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-05-31SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2019)
2019-05-22SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback