RI S0903 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the number of occasions upon which a Class A license holder under this chapter may dispense unlimited samples of wine products.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-07-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed Sub B |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2017-06-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2017) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |