RI S0901 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Amending The Membership Of The Special Legislative Commission On Defense Economy Planning (amends The Membership Of The Special Legislative Commission On Defense Economy Planning By Increasing The Number Of Members From Twenty-five (25) To Twenty-six (26) By Adding The Director Of Veteran's Affairs, Or Designee.)
Title
Joint Resolution Amending The Membership Of The Special Legislative Commission On Defense Economy Planning (amends The Membership Of The Special Legislative Commission On Defense Economy Planning By Increasing The Number Of Members From Twenty-five (25) To Twenty-six (26) By Adding The Director Of Veteran's Affairs, Or Designee.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - On defense economy planning (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - On defense economy planning (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-21 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-16 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/21/2017) |
2017-06-07 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2017) |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to House Veterans Affairs |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2017) |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2017) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |