RI S0886 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages: would allow Eleanor Manire-Gatti to join Karen M. Oliver and Edward A. Crowe in marriage within the Town of Narragansett, Rhode Island, on or about September 17, 2011
Title
An Act Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Sen. Marc Cote [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2011-05-11 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-05-11 | House passed in concurrence | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-05-04 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2011-04-27 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-04-26 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-14 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0886.pdf |