RI S0885 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-24 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-24 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Military Affairs And Defense - Emergency Management
Title
An Act Relating To Military Affairs And Defense - Emergency Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2011-06-23 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-06-21 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-14 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-06-14 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-14 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0885.pdf |