RI S0880 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Includes the benefit to customers in the PUC's study of the distribution charge.
Title
Net Metering
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2017) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2017) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |