RI S0877 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Authorizing The Town Of North Kingstown To Exempt From Taxation The Real And Personal Property Of Kingstown Crossings, L.p. Phase I Owned And Operated By Crossroads Rhode Island: authorize the Town of North Kingstown to exempt from taxation, the real and personal property of Kingstown Crossings, L.P. Phase I owned and operated by Crossroads Rhode Island, a Rhode Island 501(c)3 non-profit corporation
Title
An Act Authorizing The Town Of North Kingstown To Exempt From Taxation The Real And Personal Property Of Kingstown Crossings, L.p. Phase I Owned And Operated By Crossroads Rhode Island
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-30 | House passed in concurrence | |
2011-06-29 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-29 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2011-06-29 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to House Municipal Government | |
2011-06-15 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-06-09 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-07 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-06-07 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-14 | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0877.pdf |