RI S0871 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Limits the copayment or coinsurance requirement on specialty drugs to one hundred fifty dollars ($150) for a thirty (30) day supply.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-23 | House | Signed by Governor |
2023-06-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-06-15 | House | House passed Sub A |
2023-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2023-06-13 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2023-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2023) |
2023-05-31 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2023) |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2023) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/11/2023) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |