RI S0847 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases role of division of motor vehicles in voter registration and addresses verification process, by establishing very specific obligations and responsibilities that must be followed before offering an individual application to register to vote.
Title
Registration Of Voters
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2023) |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0847.pdf |