RI S0825 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the procedure for the licensing of constables.
Title
Procedure Generally
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Procedure generally lc 002007/2 approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Procedure generally approval of amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Procedure generally lc 002007/2 approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Procedure generally approval of amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2015-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2015-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-22 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/10/2015) |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2015) |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2015) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |