RI S0821 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Mandates insurance coverage for medically necessary expenses for standard fertility preservation services when a medical treatment may directly or indirectly cause iatrogenic infertility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coverage For Infertility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-05SenateSigned by Governor
2017-06-29SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-06-27HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2017-06-24HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2017)
2017-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2017-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2017)
2017-06-12HouseCommittee transferred to House Corporations
2017-06-09HouseReferred to House Municipal Government
2017-06-08SenateSenate passed Sub A
2017-06-06SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/08/2017)
2017-06-01SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-05-26SenateScheduled for consideration (06/01/2017)
2017-05-04SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-04-28SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2017)
2017-04-26SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback