RI S0817 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-14 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-14 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation - Residential Renewable Energy System Tax Credit (would Permit The Residential Renewable Energy System Tax Credit To Be Carried Forward For An Additional 2 Years.)
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation - Residential Renewable Energy System Tax Credit (would Permit The Residential Renewable Energy System Tax Credit To Be Carried Forward For An Additional 2 Years.)
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | Senate | Committee heard |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2013) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0817.pdf |