RI S0807 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clearly defines permanent state records to be retained/ requires preparation of disaster preparedness plan/ allows access to superior court for injunctions/ restraining orders for violations of public records laws.
Title
State Archives
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2021) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0807.pdf |