RI S0804 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires landlords to register certain identifying information on a statewide registry and for pre-1978 properties, provide a valid certificate of conformance with the lead hazard mitigation act.
Title
Residential Landlord And Tenant Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-12 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2023-06-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2023) |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2023) |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/01/2023) |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2023) |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |