RI S0777 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires an automated external defibrillator (AED) and qualified person to administer an AED at all public places capable of holding three hundred (300) people or more.
Title
Automated External Defibrillators Required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2017) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/11/2017) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2017) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |