RI S0770 | 2017 | Regular Session


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]


Provides that persons who apply to the DMV for a driver's license, its renewal or personal identification document shall simultaneously register to vote, unless they expressly decline to do so.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Registration Of Voters


Roll Calls

2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2017-09-27SenateSigned by Governor
2017-09-21SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-09-19HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2017-09-15HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017)
2017-06-29SenateSenate passed Sub A
2017-06-29SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/29/2017)
2017-06-29SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-06-27SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/29/2017)
2017-05-04SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-04-28SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2017)
2017-04-12SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary


Rhode Island State Sources

Bill Comments