RI S0765 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases tax wage base for contributions to TDI /TCI, expands eligibility, increases benefit rates, adds sibling and grandchild in coverage benefits, increases temp caregiver weeks, and institutes fines for not reinstating an employee who uses program.
Title
Temporary Disability Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0765.pdf |