RI S0765 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Scheduled for consideration (06/30/2017)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Scheduled for consideration (06/30/2017)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the dissemination of any indecent image of another person without authorization for the purpose of harassing, intimidating, threatening another person.
Title
Electronic Imaging Devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2017) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0765.pdf |