RI S0734 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the town of Scituate to provide a tax credit to disabled veterans in lieu of a tax exemption.
Title
Veterans' Exemptions--scituate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (09/14/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Committee heard |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/11/2017) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |