RI S0733 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Limits credit of tortfeasor to amount paid by released tortfeasor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procedure On Particular Actions - Contribution Among Joint Tortfeasors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-14SenateSigned by Governor
2021-07-12SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-07-01HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2021-07-01HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (07/01/2021)
2021-06-30SenateSenate read and passed
2021-06-28SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/30/2021)
2021-06-28SenateCommittee recommends passage
2021-06-25SenateScheduled for consideration (06/28/2021)
2021-04-29SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-04-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2021)
2021-03-26SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback