RI S0721 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides DOH multidisciplinary team review of drug overdose deaths may gather info of deaths from family willing to do so to help identify prevention/intervention strategies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office Of State Medical Examiners

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-06 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-12SenateSigned by Governor
2023-06-06SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-06HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2023-06-02HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/06/2023)
2023-05-30SenateSenate passed Sub A
2023-05-24SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/30/2023)
2023-05-23SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2023-05-22SenateProposed Substitute
2023-05-19SenateScheduled for consideration (05/23/2023)
2023-04-27SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-04-20SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2023)
2023-04-17SenateMeeting postponed (04/20/2023)
2023-04-14SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2023-03-22SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback