RI S0692 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the amount of time, from fourteen (14) days to twenty-eight (28) days, for a summons to issue solely based on evidence obtained by use of an automated traffic-violation-detection system.
Title
Automated Traffic Violation Monitoring Systems
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2017) |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2017) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |