RI S0690 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the state aid funding formula for compensation of school districts for the additional costs of students learning English.
Title
The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2017) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0690.pdf |