RI S0685 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the "look back" period for a third and subsequent driving under the influence (DUI) and a refusal to submit to a chemical test to ten (10) years from the current five (5) years.
Title
Motor Vehicle Offense
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2021) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0685.pdf |