RI S0672 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires physicians or duly certified registered nurse practitioners involved in the delivery and care of infants to report cases of infants born with or affected by substance abuse.
Title
Abused And Neglected Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (09/13/2017) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2017) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |