RI S0669 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the young adult voluntary extension of care program that would extend the age of foster care from age eighteen (18) to age twenty-one (21) and would provide a range of programs and services to carry out the purpose of the act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Young Adult Voluntary Extension Of Care Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-30HouseReferred to House Finance
2017-06-29SenateSenate read and passed
2017-06-29SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/29/2017)
2017-06-29SenateCommittee recommends passage
2017-06-27SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/29/2017)
2017-05-09SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-05-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2017)
2017-04-25SenateMeeting postponed (04/27/2017)
2017-04-21SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2017-03-29SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback