RI S0669 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education - Rights And Duties Of Teachers Generally
Title
An Act Relating To Education - Rights And Duties Of Teachers Generally
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2013) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0669.pdf |