RI S0668 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a lender from filing an action for a deficiency judgment following a short sale of residential property if the lender reports to the IRS it has cancelled all or part of the borrower's debt and provides the borrower with a copy of the report.
Title
Mortgage Foreclosure And Sale
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2017) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0668.pdf |