RI S0654 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a proposed private school to demonstrate financial stability.
Title
Private Schools [see Title 16 Chapter 97--rhode Island Board Of Education Act]
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0654.pdf |