RI S0652 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities: would allow the city of Providence to establish a lead court calendar within its housing court
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-15 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-15 | House passed in concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-08 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-10 | Referred to House Municipal Government | |
2011-05-05 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-05-03 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-04-28 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2011-03-29 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0652.pdf |