RI S0636 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-17 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-17 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the need for the certified envelope containing the mail ballot to be placed in the outer envelope.
Title
Mail Ballots
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/16/2015) |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2015) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2015) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |