RI S0631 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Updates the credit for reinsurance chapter of the general laws to conform to the current standard set by the National Association of Insurance Commissioners (NAIC).
Title
Credit For Reinsurance Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2021) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |