RI S0629 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions (would Make It Easier For Military Service Members And Their Spouses To Obtain Certifications And Licenses To Perform Regulated Professional Services.)
Title
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions (would Make It Easier For Military Service Members And Their Spouses To Obtain Certifications And Licenses To Perform Regulated Professional Services.)
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] |
Sen. David Bates [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-28 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Referred to House Veterans Affairs |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2013) |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/26/2013) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2013) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0629.pdf |