RI S0611 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a voter may use proof of identity which expired no more than six (6) months prior to voting.
Title
Conduct Of Election And Voting Equipment, And Supplies
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 66 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-20 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |